TX SB1176 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the punishment prescribed for the offense of evading arrest or detention.
Title
Relating to the punishment prescribed for the offense of evading arrest or detention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-06 | Record vote | |
2009-05-06 | Passed | |
2009-05-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-06 | Record vote | |
2009-05-06 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-06 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed | |
2009-02-26 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2873 (Same As) 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
AMY LYNN DONOVAN ACT
ARREST WARRANTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PEACE OFFICERS
ARREST WARRANTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PEACE OFFICERS