TX HB2873 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the punishment prescribed for the offense of evading arrest or detention.
Title
Relating to the punishment prescribed for the offense of evading arrest or detention.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Rep. Robert Miklos [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-02 | Returned to committee | |
2009-05-02 | Point of order sustained | |
2009-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1176 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
AMY LYNN DONOVAN ACT
ARREST WARRANTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PEACE OFFICERS
ARREST WARRANTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PEACE OFFICERS