TX SB1155 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Co-author authorized
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Co-author authorized
Summary
Relating to certain content requirements for an insurance consumer information website.
Title
Relating to certain content requirements for an insurance consumer information website.
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Sen. Robert Deuell [R] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-26 | Filed | |
2009-02-26 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET