TX SB1137 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the required disclosure of prices for certain items and services provided by certain medical facilities; providing administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the required disclosure of prices for certain items and services provided by certain medical facilities; providing administrative penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1284 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-20SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1284
2021-05-20HousePassed
2021-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-04-06HouseRead first time
2021-04-06SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-31SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenatePassed
2021-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-08SenateFiled
2021-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2487 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee
SB914 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1137
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01137I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01137S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01137E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01137H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01137F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01137I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01137I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01137S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01137S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01137H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01137H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01137F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-31-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1137&RcdVtNo=1284&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=110

Bill Comments 750

feedback