TX HB2487 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the required disclosure by hospitals of prices for hospital services and items; providing administrative penalties.
Title
Relating to the required disclosure by hospitals of prices for hospital services and items; providing administrative penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB914 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1137 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB1137 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital