TX SB1090 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the manufacture, distribution, sale, and provision of alcoholic beverages and the regulation of those activities.
Title
Relating to the manufacture, distribution, sale, and provision of alcoholic beverages and the regulation of those activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - SB 1090Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-22 | House | Amended |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADVERTISING
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
ATTORNEY GENERAL
BEER, BREWERIES, & BREWPUBS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
CREDIT & DEBIT CARDS
PERMITS
PUBLIC NOTICE
VENDING MACHINES
WINE & WINERIES
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
ATTORNEY GENERAL
BEER, BREWERIES, & BREWPUBS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
CREDIT & DEBIT CARDS
PERMITS
PUBLIC NOTICE
VENDING MACHINES
WINE & WINERIES