TX SB1009 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to administrative completeness requirements for permit and permit amendment applications for groundwater conservation districts.
Title
Relating to administrative completeness requirements for permit and permit amendment applications for groundwater conservation districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1629 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1629 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-04-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
PERMITS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility