TX SB1009 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Commission on Jail Standards.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Commission on Jail Standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-05-28 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-28 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-28 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-28 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-28 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-05-28 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-05-28 | Read | |
2009-05-28 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-21 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed as amended | |
2009-05-21 | Amended | |
2009-05-21 | Amended | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote reconsidered | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Passed | |
2009-04-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-16 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-01 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed | |
2009-03-05 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3392 (Same As) 2009-04-16 - Left pending in committee