TX HB3392 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Commission on Jail Standards.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Commission on Jail Standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1009 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09