TX HR957 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Keith Arthur Bryant of Georgetown on attaining the rank of Eagle Scout.
Title
Congratulating Keith Arthur Bryant of Georgetown on attaining the rank of Eagle Scout.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed |