TX HR847 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Master Sergeant Bryce Hardin on his retirement from the U.S. Air Force.
Title
Congratulating Master Sergeant Bryce Hardin on his retirement from the U.S. Air Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-12 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |