TX HR84 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Huy Hoang Nguyen and Ngoc Tram Thi Chu of the Creamery Teahouse and Tram's Teahouse for their cultural and community contributions.
Title
Commending Huy Hoang Nguyen and Ngoc Tram Thi Chu of the Creamery Teahouse and Tram's Teahouse for their cultural and community contributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-08-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-08-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-08-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-08-30 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-25 | House | Filed |