TX HR508 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Class of 2017 at Agua Dulce High School on their graduation.
Title
Congratulating the Class of 2017 at Agua Dulce High School on their graduation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-02 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-02 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-02 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |