TX HR346 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Cynthia A. Pena on her retirement from Texas Health and Human Services.
Title
Congratulating Cynthia A. Pena on her retirement from Texas Health and Human Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-03-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed |