TX HR2618 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Rabbi Ranon Teller of Congregation Brith Shalom for his contributions to the Greater Houston community.
Title
Honoring Rabbi Ranon Teller of Congregation Brith Shalom for his contributions to the Greater Houston community.
Sponsors
Rep. Al Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Adopted | |
2009-05-31 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-29 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-25 | Filed |