TX HR258 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Martha Mangum on her retirement as executive director of the Real Estate Council of San Antonio.
Title
Congratulating Martha Mangum on her retirement as executive director of the Real Estate Council of San Antonio.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-15 | House | Filed |