TX HR2477 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Beverly and Norvan Bourland on their 66th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Beverly and Norvan Bourland on their 66th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Adopted | |
2009-05-28 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-25 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-23 | Filed |