TX HR2319 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dr. Maria D. Salinas on her designation as professor emeritus at Del Mar College.
Title
Congratulating Dr. Maria D. Salinas on her designation as professor emeritus at Del Mar College.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-27 | House | Filed |