TX HR2317 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Duncan Samo on his designation as professor emeritus at Del Mar College in Corpus Christi.
Title
Congratulating Duncan Samo on his designation as professor emeritus at Del Mar College in Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-27 | House | Filed |