TX HR216 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-05 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-05 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing February 4, 2009, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 4, 2009, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-05 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-04 | Adopted | |
2009-02-04 | Rules suspended | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |
Subjects
BROWNSVILLE DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates