TX HR2124 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Brady Colby for his service as an intern in the office of State Representative Wayne Christian.
Title
Commending Brady Colby for his service as an intern in the office of State Representative Wayne Christian.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Adopted | |
2011-05-26 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-19 | Filed |