TX HR209 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Kevin Deramus on being named the 2020 Man of the Year by the Washington County Chamber of Commerce and the Brenham Economic Development Foundation.
Title
Congratulating Kevin Deramus on being named the 2020 Man of the Year by the Washington County Chamber of Commerce and the Brenham Economic Development Foundation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Leman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-03-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |