TX HR206 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Hardin-Jefferson ISD Board of Trustees on its selection as a 2017 Honor School Board by the Texas Association of School Administrators.
Title
Congratulating the Hardin-Jefferson ISD Board of Trustees on its selection as a 2017 Honor School Board by the Texas Association of School Administrators.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-08-03 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-03 | House | Filed |