TX HR1887 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Xavier Zamora of Robstown High School on his selection as a 2013 Exemplary Migrant Student by The University of Texas at Austin Migrant Student Graduation Enhancement Program.
Title
Congratulating Xavier Zamora of Robstown High School on his selection as a 2013 Exemplary Migrant Student by The University of Texas at Austin Migrant Student Graduation Enhancement Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-06 | House | Filed |