TX HR1883 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Patrick and Patricia Stroman on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Patrick and Patricia Stroman on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-14 | Adopted | |
2009-05-14 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-06 | Filed |