TX HR1820 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Marie Taylor Bosarge of Houston on her contributions to her community.
Title
Commending Marie Taylor Bosarge of Houston on her contributions to her community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-06 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-30 | House | Filed |