TX HR182 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Ovilla Christian School volleyball team on winning the 2018 TAPPS 2A state championship.
Title
Congratulating the Ovilla Christian School volleyball team on winning the 2018 TAPPS 2A state championship.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed |