TX HR1762 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating the Roscoe High School Plowboys basketball team on winning the 2009 UIL 1A Division 1 state championship.
Title
Congratulating the Roscoe High School Plowboys basketball team on winning the 2009 UIL 1A Division 1 state championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-06 | Adopted | |
2009-05-06 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-02 | Filed |