TX HR170 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Agnes Eve Pulk Farmer of Wood County on the occasion of her 90th birthday.
Title
Congratulating Agnes Eve Pulk Farmer of Wood County on the occasion of her 90th birthday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Laid before the House | |
2011-02-24 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-01-21 | Filed |