TX HR17 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 175th anniversary of the founding of the U.S. Army 3rd Cavalry Regiment.
Title
Commemorating the 175th anniversary of the founding of the U.S. Army 3rd Cavalry Regiment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-09-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-09-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-09-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-09-27 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-09-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-09-22 | House | Filed |