TX HR17 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Xochitl Escobar on being named valedictorian of Sunset High School in Dallas.
Title
Congratulating Xochitl Escobar on being named valedictorian of Sunset High School in Dallas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-28 | Adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-06-01 | Filed |