TX HR169 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the bicentennial of the establishment of the office of constable in Texas.
Title
Commemorating the bicentennial of the establishment of the office of constable in Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-07 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed |