TX HR1684 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the University of Houston Hobby Fellows for their contributions to the 86th Texas Legislative Session.
Title
Honoring the University of Houston Hobby Fellows for their contributions to the 86th Texas Legislative Session.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON HOBBY SCHOOL OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON HOBBY SCHOOL OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS