TX HR1483 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring McAllen Memorial High School on its receipt of a 2009 Honorable Mention Inspiration Award from the College Board.
Title
Honoring McAllen Memorial High School on its receipt of a 2009 Honorable Mention Inspiration Award from the College Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-30 | Adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-21 | Filed |