TX HR1412 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the grand opening of the Daikin Texas Technology Park in Waller on May 24, 2017.
Title
Commemorating the grand opening of the Daikin Texas Technology Park in Waller on May 24, 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Mike Schofield [R] | Rep. Leighton Schubert [R] |
Rep. John Raney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-13 | House | Filed |