TX HR1412 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-02 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-02 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Gregory Allen on his 2008 appointment as Chief of Police for the City of El Paso.
Title
Congratulating Gregory Allen on his 2008 appointment as Chief of Police for the City of El Paso.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-27 | Adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-17 | Filed |