TX HR141 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-27 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-27 - Reported enrolled
Summary
In memory of Lawrence F. "Larry" Blais of Weatherford.
Title
In memory of Lawrence F. "Larry" Blais of Weatherford.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-26 | Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-05 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-03 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-01-21 | Filed |