TX HR105 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 46th anniversary of Mickey Leland being sworn in as a member of the Texas House of Representatives.
Title
Commemorating the 46th anniversary of Mickey Leland being sworn in as a member of the Texas House of Representatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |