TX HJR71 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing certain judges to become a candidate for another office without automatically resigning from the office already held.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing certain judges to become a candidate for another office without automatically resigning from the office already held.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-11 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR71 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00071I.htm |