TX HCR87 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

In memory of former state representative John Clifford Otto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memory of former state representative John Clifford Otto.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-11SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-11HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-11HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-10SenateRead & adopted
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseAdopted
2021-04-30HouseLaid before the House
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2021-04-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback