TX HCR44 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to pass S.2896, the Care Veterans Deserve Act of 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to pass S.2896, the Care Veterans Deserve Act of 2016.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-12HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
2017-01-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback