TX HCR44 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to pass S.2896, the Care Veterans Deserve Act of 2016.
Title
Urging Congress to pass S.2896, the Care Veterans Deserve Act of 2016.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-12 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-01-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CARE VETERANS DESERVE ACT OF 2016
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress