TX HCR19 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the creation of a joint interim committee to study the impact on Texas of any proposed modifications to NAFTA.
Title
Requesting the creation of a joint interim committee to study the impact on Texas of any proposed modifications to NAFTA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-24 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-07-21 | House | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs |
2017-07-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Interim Studies
NORTH AMERICAN FREE TRADE AGREEMENT
NORTH AMERICAN FREE TRADE AGREEMENT--NAFTA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
NORTH AMERICAN FREE TRADE AGREEMENT
NORTH AMERICAN FREE TRADE AGREEMENT--NAFTA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HCR19 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HC00019I.htm |