TX HB927 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for the offense of indecent exposure.
Title
Relating to the punishment for the offense of indecent exposure.
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Anderson [R] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Linda Harper-Brown [R] |
Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION