TX HB915 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration and monitoring of health care provided to foster children.
Title
Relating to the administration and monitoring of health care provided to foster children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - HB 915Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - HB 915Third Reading House (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - HB 915Third Reading House (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-17 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-16 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-19 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-19 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-19 | House | Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety