TX HB822 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to gestational agreements.
Title
Relating to gestational agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2027 (Similar To) 2009-05-01 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence