TX HB800 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an interlocal contract between a governmental entity and a purchasing cooperative to purchase roofing materials or services.
Title
Relating to an interlocal contract between a governmental entity and a purchasing cooperative to purchase roofing materials or services.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Stefani Carter [R] | Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Rep. Wayne Smith [R] | Rep. Raul Torres [R] | Rep. Vicki Truitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Point of order sustained | |
2011-05-13 | Point of order overruled | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | |
2011-03-14 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Intergovernmental Relations
Political Subdivisions
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Intergovernmental Relations
Political Subdivisions
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local