TX HB782 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Postponed 12/25/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Postponed 12/25/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for certain petitions requesting an election and ballot propositions.
Title
Relating to requirements for certain petitions requesting an election and ballot propositions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Postponed 12/25/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-12 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(a) |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1430 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
SECRETARY OF STATE
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
SECRETARY OF STATE