TX SB1430 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for certain petitions requesting an election and ballot propositions and to related procedures and provisions.
Title
Relating to requirements for certain petitions requesting an election and ballot propositions and to related procedures and provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB782 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Postponed 12/25/21 10:00 AM
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
SECRETARY OF STATE
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
SECRETARY OF STATE