TX HB78 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authorization by referendum of an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the authorization by referendum of an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#907 (Y: 84 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Failed to pass RV#867 (Y: 63 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Failed to pass RV#867 (Y: 63 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#907 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment withdrawn 1-Howard, et al. |
2023-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2023-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2023-05-02 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#867 |
2023-05-02 | House | Failed to pass |
2023-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Howard, Goodwin, Hinojosa, Flores, Talarico, Cole, and Troxclair |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Lujan |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
County Government
County Government--General
Elections
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
METROPOLITAN PLANNING ORGANIZATIONS
MEXICO
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
County Government
County Government--General
Elections
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
METROPOLITAN PLANNING ORGANIZATIONS
MEXICO
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration